Playing with Numbers is My Hobby

Playing with Numbers is My Hobby

                                                 

                 Numbers are Amazing and have Own Value


Whenever I have free time used to play with numbers and sometime I got very wonderful results, here is one more article for the mathematics passionate and scholars and my main aim is whatever I have, firmly believe in Sharing (DO NOT LIKE PUT ITIN THE IDIOT BOX).

Just put 12 and square 2 it is 4 put it with12 (124) same as 13 square 3 it 9 put (139) and keep continuing and get amazing result.

And it is 12*2=24, 13*3=39, 14*4=56(sum of 4+1=5), 15*5=75 (sum of 5+2=7)……………………………

This brief article is beneficial for the Mathematics Lovers and Scholars.

100 = 10*0 = 00

111 = 11*1 = 11                                                                                                

124 = 12*2 = 24

139 = 13*3 = 39

1416 = 14*4 = 56

1525 = 15*5 =75

1636 = 16*6 =96

1749 = 17*7 =119

1864 = 18*8 =144

1981 = 19*9 =171

20100=110100 = 20*10 =200   (it looks like as in Binary…….).

21121=111121 = 21*11 =231

22144=112144 = 22*12 =264

23169=113169 = 23*13 =299

24196=114196 = 24*14 =336

25225=115225 = 25*15 =375

26256=116256 = 26*16 =416

27289=117289 = 27*17 =459

28324=118324 = 28*18 =504

29361=119361 = 29*19 =551

30400=120400 = 30*20 =600

31441=121441 = 31*21 =651

32484=122484 = 32*22 =704

33529=123529 = 33*23 =759

34576=124576 = 34*24 =816

35625=125625 = 35*25 =875

36676=126676 = 36*26 =936

37729=127729 = 37*27 =999

38784=128784 = 38*28 =1064

39841=129841 = 39*29 =1131

40900=130900 = 40*30 =1200

41961=131961 = 41*31 =1271

421024=1321024 = 42*32 =1344

431089=1331089 = 43*33 =1419

441156=1341156 = 44*34 =1496

451225=1351225 = 45*35 =1575

461296=1361296 = 46*36 =1656

471369=1371369 = 47*37 =1739

481444=1381444 = 48*38 =1824

491521=1391521 = 49*39 =1911

501600=1401600 = 50*40 =2000

511681=1411681 = 51*41 =2091

521764=1421764 = 52*42=2184

531849=1431849 = 53*43 =2279

541936=1441936 = 54*44 =2376

552025=1452025 = 55*45 =2475

562116=1462116 = 56*46 =2576

572209=1472209 = 57*47 =2679

582304=1482304 = 58*48 =2784

592401=1492401 = 59*49 =2891

602500=1502500 = 60*50 =3000


Copyrighted to PiyushGoel

http://www.piyushgoel.in

https://piyushtheorem.wordpress.com/



No corresponding comment